EP2259425 - Piezoelectric thin-film resonator and filter using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsutsumi, Jun c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Yokoyama, Tsuyoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Sakashita, Takeshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Taniguchi, Shinji c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Iwaki, Masafumi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Nishihara, Tokihiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Ueda, Masanori c/o FUJITSU MEDIA DEVICES LIMITED 3-12, Shin-Yokohama 2-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London, Greater London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10170336.1 | 26.10.2005 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | JP20040313727 | 28.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004313727 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2259425 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
H03H9/02149 (EP,US);
H03H9/17 (KR);
H03H9/02118 (EP,US);
H03H9/132 (EP,US);
H03H9/174 (EP,US);
H03H2003/0428 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/49] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Dünnschichtresonator und Filter mit einem derartigen Resonator | [2010/49] | English: | Piezoelectric thin-film resonator and filter using the same | [2010/49] | French: | Résonateur piézoélectrique à couche mince et filtre l'utilisant | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2012 | 12.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/14] | 22.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 10.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05256649.4 / EP1653612 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050256649) is 17.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3382381 (HORTON WILLIAM H); | [Y]JPS60149215 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]EP1126601 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [Y]US2002190814 (YAMADA TETSUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US6657363 (AIGNER ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]JP2004104449 (FUJITSU MEDIA DEVICE KK, et al); | [Y]EP1406383 (TDK CORP [JP]) | Examination | US6441539 | US2003003612 | US2003015941 | EP1533896 | by applicant | JP2002372974 | US6657363 | JP2004120494 |