09.06.2023 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
11.08.2017 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
16.12.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
07.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
15.07.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
17.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
04.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
06.11.2015 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
16.10.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
07.08.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
03.08.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.03.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
10.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
31.01.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
17.09.2010 |
Change - German title |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
17.09.2010 |
Change - German title |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
17.09.2010 |
Change - English title |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
17.09.2010 |
Change - French title |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
10.09.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
10.09.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
03.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|