Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006060291 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2009 | A3 | WO2006060291 | 09.08.2007 | A8 | WO2006060291 | 08.06.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005055954 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2006 | A3 | WO2005055954 | 23.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008125897 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | US93554607 | 06.11.2007 | US33555202 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006136081 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35443706 | 15.02.2006 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | US33555202 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006133966 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35521606 | 15.02.2006 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | US33555202 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7171992 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2007 | B2 | US2006130927 | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35521506 | 15.02.2006 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | US33555202 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7317967 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2008 | B2 | US2005086008 | 21.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | US33555202 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7343224 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2008 | B2 | US2004087888 | 06.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | US33555202 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5400120B | Global Dossier | 29.01.2014 | B2 | JP2012011251 | 19.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5341953B | Global Dossier | 13.11.2013 | B2 | JP2011194256 | 06.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5015790B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2012 | B2 | JP2008521555 | 26.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | WO2005US42834 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007515213 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | WO2004US41356 | 19.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005526540 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2466303 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | EP05825487 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1836663 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | B1 | EP1836663 | 20.01.2010 | A4 | EP1836663 | 26.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | WO2005US42834 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1689362 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2018 | B2 | EP1689362 | 14.09.2011 | B1 | EP1689362 | 20.01.2010 | A4 | EP1689362 | 16.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | WO2004US41356 | 19.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1461729 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2006 | A4 | EP1461729 | 29.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009200122B | Global Dossier | 05.11.2009 | B2 | AU2009200122 | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2002360840 | 31.12.2002 | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | AU2009200122 | 13.01.2009 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008229933B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | B2 | AU2008229933 | 13.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2002360840 | 31.12.2002 | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | AU2008229933 | 14.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008229926 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2002360840 | 31.12.2002 | AU2008229926 | 14.10.2008 | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005312107B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | B2 | AU2005312107 | 08.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | WO2005US42834 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004296872B | Global Dossier | 21.05.2009 | B2 | AU2004296872 | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | WO2004US41356 | 19.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002360840B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2008 | B2 | AU2002360840 | 24.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2239669 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | B8 | EP2239669 | 09.09.2015 | B1 | EP2239669 | 13.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02796129 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0215301 | 21.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0417310 | 27.07.2021 | B8 | BRPI0417310 | 24.11.2020 | B1 | BRPI0417310 | 27.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | WO2004US41356 | 19.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0518778 | 27.07.2021 | B8 | BRPI0518778 | 26.12.2017 | B1 | BRPI0518778 | 09.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | WO2005US42834 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2472196 | 29.10.2013 | C | CA2472196 | 17.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2548536 | 05.06.2012 | C | CA2548536 | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | WO2004US41356 | 19.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2588890 | 14.07.2015 | C | CA2588890 | 08.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | WO2005US42834 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2824406 | 17.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2472196 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100543621C | 23.09.2009 | C | CN101019081 | 15.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101443770B | 19.01.2011 | B | CN101443770 | 27.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | WO2005US42834 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2372374T | 12.06.2019 | T5 | ES2372374T | 19.01.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | WO2004US41356 | 19.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2528358T | 09.02.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | WO2005US42834 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1088852 | 17.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | WO2004US41356 | 19.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007006644 | 14.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US323204 | 03.12.2004 | WO2005US42834 | 23.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04006493 | 31.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0241759 | 31.12.2002 | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06006430 | 23.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US72856003 | 05.12.2003 | WO2004US41356 | 19.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7194336 | 20.03.2007 | B2 | US2003158508 | 21.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | US33555202 | 31.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03058507 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5403687B | Global Dossier | 29.01.2014 | B2 | JP2010137082 | 24.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5022410B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2012 | B2 | JP2009226227 | 08.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009219899 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5264632B | Global Dossier | 14.08.2013 | B2 | JP2009213932 | 24.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100422989C | 01.10.2008 | C | CN1623147 | 01.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101143307B | 04.08.2010 | B | CN101143307 | 19.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2552908T | 03.12.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US34486901 | 31.12.2001 | Type | Earlier application | EP1461729 |