EP2239669 - Pharmaceutical compounding information management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/41] | Verwaltungssystem für pharmazeutische zusammensetzungsinformationen | ||
[2010/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Medical, Inc. 824 Twelfth Avenue Bethlehem PA 18018-0027 / US | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DiGianfilippo, Aleandro 29192 North 78th Street Scottsdale, AZ 85262 / US | 02 /
Pierce, Richard F. 19730 North 52 ND Avenue Glendale, AZ 85308 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
DiGianfilippo, Aleandro 29192 North 78th Street Scottsdale, AZ 85262 / US | ||
02 /
Pierce, Richard F. 19730 North 52 ND Avenue Glendale, AZ 85308 / US | |||
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
DiGianfilippo, Aleandro 19192 North 78th Street Scottsdale, AZ 85262 / US | ||
02 /
Pierce, Richard F. 19730 North 52 ND Avenue Glendale, AZ 85308 / US | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/10] | Kühn, Alexander Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/41] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10171001.0 | 31.12.2002 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | US20010344869P | 31.12.2001 Original published format: US 344869 P | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2239669 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2239669 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2239669 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2010/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwaltungssystem für pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungsinformationen | [2015/47] | English: | Pharmaceutical compounding information management system | [2010/42] | French: | Système de gestion d'informations relatives à la formulation pharmaceutique | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/41] | Système de gestion d'informations relatives à la formulation pharmaceutique | ||
Former [2010/41] | Verwaltungssystem für pharmazeutische zusammensetzungsinformationen | ||
Former [2010/41] | Pharmaceutical compounding information management system | Examination procedure | 28.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02796129.1 / EP1461729 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020796129) is 21.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | IE | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | LU | 31.12.2015 | PT | 11.01.2016 | [2023/28] |
Former [2017/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
IE | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
IE | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
IE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IT | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
IE | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
IE | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IE | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
LU | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
GR | 10.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB1273640 (CRYOGENIC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [I]US4333356 (BARTELS HERMANN, et al) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 11 - line 68 *; | [I]JPS5870079 (PILOT PEN CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * abstract * |