EP2281852 - PNEUMATIC TIRE COMPRISING A FILM COMPOSED OF A THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER COMPOSITION AS INNER LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/06] | Thermoplastic elastomer composition | ||
[2015/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | ||
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Company, Limited 36-11 Shimbashi 5 chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Koichi c/o THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | 02 /
Morooka, Naoyuki c/o THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2016/10] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Koichi c/o THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | ||
02 /
Morooka, Naoyuki c/o THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2011/06] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10171726.2 | 03.08.2010 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | JP20090180918 | 03.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009180918 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2281852 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2281852 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L29/04, C08L51/04, // C08K5/17, C08K5/372 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
B60C1/0008 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/372 (EP,US);
C08K5/3725 (EP,US);
C08K5/42 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L29/04, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2011/06] | C08L29/04, C08L51/04, B60C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2011/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN MIT EINEM FILM AUS EINEM THERMOPLASTISCHEN ELASTOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG ALS INNENSCHICHT | [2015/34] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE COMPRISING A FILM COMPOSED OF A THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER COMPOSITION AS INNER LINER | [2015/34] | French: | PNEU COMPRENANT UN FILM COMPOSÉ D'UNE COMPOSITION D'ÉLASTOMÈRE THERMOPLASTIQUE EN TANT QUE REVÊTEMENT INTERNE | [2015/39] |
Former [2011/06] | Thermoplastische Elastomerzusammensetzung | ||
Former [2011/06] | Thermoplastic elastomer composition | ||
Former [2011/06] | Compositions élastomères thermoplastiques | Examination procedure | 03.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 27.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2010 | AL | 09.03.2016 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | HR | 09.03.2016 | IT | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | MK | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | SM | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | NO | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | GB | 03.08.2016 | IE | 03.08.2016 | LU | 03.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 03.08.2010 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.08.2010 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.08.2010 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2007211059 ; | [X]JP2002060500 ; | [X]EP1338621 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1,5,6* paragraph [0038]; claim -; table 1 *; | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 81, Database accession no. 2007-877057, XP002609801 & JP2007211059 A 20070823 (JSR CORP) [XD] 1,4-6 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 52, Database accession no. 2002-482467, XP002609834 & JP2002060500 A 20020226 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * | Examination | EP1974907 | by applicant | JP2006161045 | JP2007211059 |