03.05.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
28.01.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.08.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.12.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.09.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2016 |
First examination report |
|
12.02.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
04.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
23.05.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
14.05.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.10.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
11.10.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
06.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|