EP2292315 - Method and device for the purification of combustion flue gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAB SA 25 Rue Bossuet 69006 Lyon / FR | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siret, Bernard / 1 rue Jean Duclos 69200, VENISSIEUX / FR | 02 /
Tabaries, Franck / 273, Chemin Haut Sainte Barbe 83190, OLLIOULES / FR | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Siret, Bernard 1 rue Jean Duclos 69200, VENISSIEUX / FR | ||
02 /
Tabaries, Franck 273, Chemin Haut Sainte Barbe 83190, OLLIOULES / FR | Representative(s) | Grand, Guillaume, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Grand, Guillaume, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 68448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2011/10] | Grand, Guillaume, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10171844.3 | 04.08.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | FR20090055511 | 05.08.2009 Original published format: FR 0955511 | [2011/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292315 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292315 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/83, B01D53/50, B01D53/34, B01D53/40, B01D53/44 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
B01D53/40 (EP);
B01D53/346 (EP);
B01D53/83 (EP);
B01D2257/2045 (EP);
B01D2257/2064 (EP);
B01D2257/302 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Verbrennungsabgasen | [2011/10] | English: | Method and device for the purification of combustion flue gases | [2011/10] | French: | Procédé et installation d'épuration de fumées de combustion | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 06.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2010 | AL | 09.05.2012 | CY | 09.05.2012 | CZ | 09.05.2012 | EE | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | HR | 09.05.2012 | LT | 09.05.2012 | LV | 09.05.2012 | MK | 09.05.2012 | MT | 09.05.2012 | RO | 09.05.2012 | SI | 09.05.2012 | SK | 09.05.2012 | SM | 09.05.2012 | TR | 09.05.2012 | IE | 04.08.2012 | LU | 04.08.2012 | BG | 09.08.2012 | NO | 09.08.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | IS | 09.09.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AL | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
SM | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
LU | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
SM | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
LU | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 09.05.2012 | |
NO | 09.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0104335 (BABCOCK ANLAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 35 * * page 8, line 5 - line 8; figure -; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4889698 (MOLLER JENS T [DK], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 28 - line 57 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0646404 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 19 - line 36 * * figure .; claim - *; | [A]EP1537905 (AUSTRIAN ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT [AT]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * figure .; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP1875953 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1-9* figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1955758 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012]; figure - * | by applicant | US4889698 | EP0646404 | EP1537907 |