EP2416512 - Optical communication method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jansen, Sander / Alfred-Schmidt-Str 5 81379, Munich / DE | 02 /
Van Den Borne, Dirk / Leo-Graetz-Str. 5 81379, München / DE | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/06] | Application number, filing date | 10171861.7 | 04.08.2010 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416512 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/155 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
H04J14/02 (EP,US);
H04B10/07955 (EP);
H04B10/548 (EP);
H04B10/572 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/0066 (EP);
H04L27/2626 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optisches Kommunikationsverfahren und Vorrichtung | [2012/06] | English: | Optical communication method and apparatus | [2012/06] | French: | Procédé de communication optique et appareil | [2012/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/06] | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0173980 (LEE JAE SEUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 7 - page 2, line 6 * * page 3, line 2 - line 10 * * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 2; figure 1 ** page 5, line 13 - page 8, line 15; figures 2,3 *; | [XI]EP1324516 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,3-9,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0055]; figures 2,4 * [I] 2,10-13; | [A] - SANDER LARS JANSEN ET AL, "Past, present and future of optical OFDM", COMMUNICATIONS AND PHOTONICS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, 2009. ACP 2009. ASIA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091102), ISBN 978-1-55752-877-3, pages 1 - 5, XP031623275 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 2; figures 4,5 * |