Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8427755 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2013 | B2 | US2011051255 | 03.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090081633 | 31.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101680300B | Global Dossier | 28.11.2016 | B1 | KR20110023630 | 08.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090081633 | 31.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2290410 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B1 | EP2290410 | 02.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090081633 | 31.08.2009 |