EP2289318 - Use of tetramic acid derivatives for fighting insects of familiy of tortrix moths (Tortricidae) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG BCS-BPA-LP-PL Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG BCS-BPA-LP-PL Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Reiner, Dr. Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 23 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
Brueck, Ernst, Dr. Holzemer Strasse 6 53343 Wachtberg-Villip / DE | 03 /
van Waetermeulen, Xavier, Alain, Marie 45, chemin du Mont 69480 Morance / FR | [2011/09] | Application number, filing date | 10171970.6 | 09.05.2007 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | DE20061022821 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006022821 | [2011/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289318 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/38, A01N47/06, A01P7/04 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
A01N43/38 (EP,KR,US);
A01N47/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Tetramsäurederivaten zur Bekämpfung von Insekten aus der Familie der Wickler (Tortricidae) | [2011/09] | English: | Use of tetramic acid derivatives for fighting insects of familiy of tortrix moths (Tortricidae) | [2011/09] | French: | Utilisation de dérivés d'acide tétramique destinés à lutter contre les insectes de la famille des Tortricidae | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 20.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07725016.5 / EP2023723 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070725016) is 07.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9635664 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * page 108, line 1 - line 10 * * examples 1-5,11,12 *; | [A]WO0248321 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 19 - line 21 * * page 4, line 15 - line 21 ** page 5, line 22 - line 27; example 4 *; | [ID]WO2004007448 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [ID] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 55, line 18 - line 27 * * examples A-K * | by applicant | EP0456063 | EP0521334 | EP0596298 | EP0613884 | WO9501997 | WO9520572 | EP0668267 | WO9526954 | WO9625395 | WO9635664 | WO9701535 | WO9702243 | WO9736868 | WO9743275 | WO9805638 | WO9806721 | WO9825928 | WO9916748 | WO9924437 | WO9943649 | WO9948869 | WO9955673 | WO0109092 | WO0117972 | WO0123354 | WO0174770 | WO03013249 | WO2004007448 | WO2004024688 | WO2004065366 | WO2004080962 | WO2004111042 | WO2005044791 | WO2005044796 | WO2005048710 | WO2005049596 | WO2005066125 | WO2005092897 | WO2006000355 | WO2006029799 | WO2006056281 | WO2006056282 | WO2006077071 | WO2006089633 |