EP2272497 - Methods of increasing lymphatic function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/02] | Methods Of Increasing Lymphatic Function | ||
[2012/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Detmar, Michael Rebbergstrasse 5 8113 Boppelsen / CH | 02 /
Kajiya, Kentaro 3-207-5, Sengen-cho, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0072 / JP | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
Detmar, Michael Rebbergstrasse 5 8113 Boppelsen / CH | ||
02 /
Kajiya, Kentaro 3-207-5, Sengen-cho, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/02] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10172193.4 | 18.01.2007 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | US20060760328P | 18.01.2006 Original published format: US 760328 P | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2272497 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2272497 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2272497 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/64, A61Q19/00, A61P17/16, A61K38/18, // C07K16/22, G01N33/68, A61K39/395 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/179 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/1866 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61Q19/004 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/22 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/6863 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/6887 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2800/70 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
G01N2333/515 (EP,US);
G01N2333/52 (EP,US);
G01N2500/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | A61K8/64, A61K39/395, A61Q19/00, A61P17/16, A61K38/18, // C07K16/22 | ||
Former IPC [2011/02] | A61K8/64, A61K39/395, A61Q19/00, A61P17/16, // C07K16/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Lymphfunktion | [2011/02] | English: | Methods of increasing lymphatic function | [2012/20] | French: | Procédés pour augmenter la fonction lymphatique | [2011/02] |
Former [2011/02] | Methods Of Increasing Lymphatic Function | Examination procedure | 06.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07717966.1 / EP1984522 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070717966) is 09.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2007 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | IE | 18.01.2013 | LU | 18.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IE | 18.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IE | 18.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005097187 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al); | by applicant | US4399216 | US4634665 | EP0239400 | WO9007861 | US4987071 | US5093246 | US5116742 | US5179017 | US5530101 | WO9634096 | US5585089 | US5648260 | US5693762 | US5693761 | US5789650 | US5798230 | US5849992 | WO0042219 | US6407213 | US6511808 | US6534261 | US2003070185 | US2003143204 | US6602503 | US2003166282 | US2003224432 | US2003232333 | US2004038278 | US2004086884 |