EP2244478 - Broadcast program recording and playing apparatus and portable terminal for recording and playing broadcast programs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawana, Koichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Yoko c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
Korehisa, Makoto c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/43] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10172596.8 | 10.08.2001 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | JP20000246795 | 16.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000246795 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2244478 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/782 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
H04N21/4227 (EP,US);
H04N7/14 (KR);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/4135 (EP,US);
H04N21/42209 (EP,US);
H04N21/4222 (EP,US);
H04N21/42221 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N5/38 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/43] | Title | German: | Anlage zum Aufnehmen und Abspielen von Fernsehprogrammen und tragbares Endgerät zum Aufnehmen und Abspielen von Fernsehprogrammen | [2010/43] | English: | Broadcast program recording and playing apparatus and portable terminal for recording and playing broadcast programs | [2010/43] | French: | Appareil pour enregistrer et reproduire des programmes de télévision, et dispositif terminal pour enregistrer et reproduire des programmes de télévision | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 11.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01306829.1 / EP1182871 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010306829) is 26.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9904561 (GUIDE E INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5945988 (WILLIAMS CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [X]WO0004709 (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2343074 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 2 * * page 3 * * page 4 * * page 9 * * page 10 * * page 20 * * figures 1-3,12,14,15 *; | [I]US6075812 (CAFARELLA JOHN H [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | US5710605 |