EP2302145 - Gabion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/13] | Support column for gabions | ||
[2015/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patech GmbH Donislstrasse 1 94436 Simbach / DE | [2015/40] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Patech GmbH An der Schule 16 94436 Simbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beer, Alfred An der Höll 33 94405, Niederhöcking / DE | 02 /
Schall, Klaus Donislstrasse 1 94436, Simbach / DE | [2015/45] |
Former [2015/31] | 01 /
Beer, Alfred An der Höll 33 94405, Niederhöcking / DE | ||
02 /
Schall, Klaus An der Schule 16 94436, Simbach / DE | |||
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Beer, Alfred An der Höll 33 94405, Niederhöcking / DE | ||
02 /
Schall, Klaus An der Schule 16 94436, Simbach / DE | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstraße 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2011/13] | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstraße 6a D-84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 10172663.6 | 12.08.2010 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | DE20092011073U | 28.09.2009 Original published format: DE 202009011073 U | [2011/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2302145 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2302145 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302145 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/84, E04H17/16, E01F8/02, E04H17/20 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
E01F8/025 (EP);
E04H17/20 (EP,US);
E04B2/84 (EP);
E04H17/161 (EP,US);
E04H17/168 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | E04B2/84, E04H17/16, E01F8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2011/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Steinkorb | [2015/19] | English: | Gabion | [2015/19] | French: | Gabion | [2015/19] |
Former [2011/13] | Wandsäule für Steinkörbe | ||
Former [2011/13] | Support column for gabions | ||
Former [2011/13] | Collonne de support pour gabions | Examination procedure | 14.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 15.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2010 | AL | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | IE | 12.08.2015 | LU | 12.08.2015 | GB | 29.10.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5647695 (HILFIKER HAROLD K [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 9, line 6 - line 37; figures 36, 38, 39, 40 * [I] 2; | [A]DE202006013903U (GEIGER GMBH STEIN UND SCHOTTER [DE]) [A] 2,4* abstract *; | [A]DE202006017921U (LEHRHUBER KONRAD [AT]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0061]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094]; figure 40 * |