EP2314359 - Golf ball having an aerodynamic coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2013/40] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Nike International, Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fitchett, Derek c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR OR 97005 / US | [2013/40] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
Fitchett, Derek c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR OR 97005 / US | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/17] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10172697.4 | 12.08.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | US20090569955 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: US 569955 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314359 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2314359 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A63B37/00, A63B37/12, A63B45/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
A63B45/00 (EP,US);
A63B37/00221 (EP,US);
A63B37/00222 (EP,US);
A63B37/0075 (EP,US);
A63B37/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | Golfball mit aerodynamischer Beschichtung | [2011/17] | English: | Golf ball having an aerodynamic coating | [2011/17] | French: | Balle de golf dotée d'un revêtement aérodynamique | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2010 | AL | 02.10.2013 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BE | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | ES | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | IT | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MK | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | SM | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009111614 (OHIRA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0020] - [0028] , [0029] , [0035] , [0038] - [0045] - [0053] , [0055]; table - * [I] 12; | [X]US6193617 (MERTENS PETER [US]) [X] 1,2,4-11,14 * column 2, lines 10-17 - column 3, lines 3-63 * * column 4, lines 48-54 - column 5, lines 37-67 * * column 6, lines 1-4; figure - *; | [X]US2003148828 (ISOGAWA KAZUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-11,14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0027] - [0031] - [0036] , [0050]; table - *; | [X]US2007015602 (WATANABE HIDEO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0022] - [0024]; table - *; | [X]US2003114252 (HAYASHI JUNJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0059]; table - * | by applicant | US6821315 | US20090470820 |