12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
13.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
15.11.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
06.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
07.12.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
03.12.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.12.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.07.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
13.07.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
15.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.04.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2011 |
First examination report |
|
25.09.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
18.02.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |