EP2299082 - Exhaust system, a saddle riding type vehicle having the same, and a method of manufacturing and mounting an exhaust pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai, Iwata-shi SHIZUOKA-KEN 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADACHI, Makoto c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2500 Shing Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2013/02] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
ADACHI, Makoto c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2500 Shing Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner P.O. Box 246 82043 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner P.O. Box 246 82043 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 10172745.1 | 13.08.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | JP20090202642 | 02.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009202642 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299082 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2299082 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/18, F01N13/14, // F01N13/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
F01N13/008 (EP,US);
F01N13/141 (EP,US);
F01N13/18 (EP,US);
F01N2450/20 (EP,US);
F01N2470/24 (EP,US);
F01N2590/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49398 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | Abgassystem, Sattelfahrzeug damit und Verfahren zur Herstellung und Montage eines Abgasrohrs | [2011/12] | English: | Exhaust system, a saddle riding type vehicle having the same, and a method of manufacturing and mounting an exhaust pipe | [2011/12] | French: | Système d'échappement, véhicule de type à enfourcher en disposant et procédé de fabrication et d'assemblage d'un conduit d'échappement | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2010 | AL | 09.01.2013 | AT | 09.01.2013 | BE | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | HR | 09.01.2013 | IT | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | MK | 09.01.2013 | MT | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | SM | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | NO | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | IE | 13.08.2013 | LU | 13.08.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
LU | 13.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006029201 (DONALDSON CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,10 * page 6, line 18 - line 24; figure 1 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 1 * [I] 6,11,14; | [A]EP0722040 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 36; figures 3,5,7-9 *; | [A]JPH1052721 (SANGO CO LTD) [A] 15 * abstract *; | [A]JPS60150417 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 12,14 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH11257072 | JP2002332838 |