EP2287782 - System, Method And Program Product For Camera-Based Object Analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.10.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doretto, Gianfranco 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Yao, Yi 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10172954.9 | 16.08.2010 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | US20090542994 | 18.08.2009 Original published format: US 542994 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2287782 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2287782 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/52, G06K9/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G06V20/176 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (KR);
G06T7/20 (KR);
G06V10/435 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System, Verfahren und Programm für kamerabasierte Objektanalyse | [2011/08] | English: | System, Method And Program Product For Camera-Based Object Analysis | [2011/08] | French: | Système, procédé et produit de programme pour analyse d'objet à base de caméra | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 09.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/10] | 23.10.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - "Chapter 7: Object description", Mark S. Nixon & Alberto S. Aguado, Feature Extraction & Image Processing, Oxford, UK, Elsevier Ltd., (20080101), pages 281 - 328, ISBN 978-0-12372-538-7, XP002721059 [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * sections 7.1, 7.3.1, 7.3.2 * [I] 2,3,8 | [X] - EIKVIL L ET AL, "Classification-based vehicle detection in high-resolution satellite images", ISPRS JOURNAL OF PHOTOGRAMMETRY AND REMOTE SENSING, AMSTERDAM [U.A.] : ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 64, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.ISPRSJPRS.2008.09.005, ISSN 0924-2716, (20090101), pages 65 - 72, (20081030), XP025870142 [X] 1-10 * Abstract * * sections 1, 3.2, 3.3, 4.3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.isprsjprs.2008.09.005 | [I] - ZHENFENG ZHU ET AL, "Car detection based on multi-cues integration", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2004. ICPR 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 17TH INTERNAT IONAL CONFERENCE ON CAMBRIDGE, UK AUG. 23-26, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (20040823), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ICPR.2004.1334355, ISBN 978-0-7695-2128-2, pages 699 - 702, XP010724488 [I] 1-10 * sections 1, 3, 5 * * figures 4, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2004.1334355 | [XI] - MIKOLAJCZYK K ET AL, "A performance evaluation of local descriptors", PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20051001), vol. 27, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2005.188, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 1615 - 1630, XP002384824 [X] 1-6,8-10 * Abstract * * sections 1, 3.2, 5 * * figure 3 * [I] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2005.188 | [A] - Anonymous, "Visual Geometry Group Home Page", (20080613), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080613071329/http://www.robots.ox.ac.uk/~vgg/research/texclass/filters.html, (20140303), XP055105063 [A] 7 * section "The Schmid (S) Filter Bank" * | Examination | - Richard O. Duda ET AL, "Pattern Classification", Pattern Classification, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, US, (20010101), pages 49 - 52, XP055359646 |