11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
06.12.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
28.12.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] |
21.12.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.12.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.09.2012 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
28.08.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
17.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.02.2012 |
First examination report |
|
06.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.11.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.11.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
25.03.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
21.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |