EP2278840 - Handover in a communication network comprising plural heterogeneous access networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachmann, Jens c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH, Monzastras 63225, Langen / DE | 02 /
Bourgett, Alexander c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH, Monzastras 63225, Langen / DE | [2013/20] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Bachmann, Jens c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH, Monzastras 63225, Langen / DE | ||
02 /
Bourgett, Alexander c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH, Monzastras 63225, Langen / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10173279.0 | 26.10.2004 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | EP20030026069 | 12.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03026069 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2278840 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2278840 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, H04W36/14, // H04L12/28, H04W36/00, H04W8/22 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
H04W36/0033 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L12/2856 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L69/32 (KR);
H04W8/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/22 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W92/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/1446 (EP,BR,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/04] | H04W48/18, H04W36/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | Handover-Verfahren in einem Kommunikationsnetz welches mehrere heterogene Access-Netze umfasst | [2011/04] | English: | Handover in a communication network comprising plural heterogeneous access networks | [2011/04] | French: | Procédé de transfert dans un réseau de communication comprenant plusieurs réseaux d'accès hétérogènes | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04790866.0 / EP1692903 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040790866) is 26.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2004 | AT | 15.05.2013 | BE | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | IT | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SE | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | ES | 26.08.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | GB | 26.10.2013 | IE | 26.10.2013 | LU | 26.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 26.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 26.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002059453 (ERIKSSON GORAN A P [SE], et al); | [I]WO02093955 (NOVATEL WIRELESS INC [US]); | [XI]US6591103 (DUNN JAMES M [US], et al); | [I]WO03079700 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) |