EP2288049 - Method and device for user pairing for uplink multi-user MIMO under coordinated multiple point transmission scenario [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/27] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cui, Qimei P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU Haidian District Beijing 100876 / CN | 02 /
Li, Shiyuan P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU Haidian District Beijing 100876 / CN | 03 /
Tao, Xiaofeng P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU Haidian District Beijing 100876 / CN | 04 /
Wang, Chao P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU Haidian District Beijing 100876 / CN | 05 /
Yang, Xianjun P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU Haidian District Beijing 100876 / CN | [2017/27] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
Cui, Qimei P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU 100876, HAI DIAN District / CN | ||
02 /
Li, Shiyuan P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU 100876, HAI DIAN District / CN | |||
03 /
Tao, Xiaofeng P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU 100876, HAI DIAN District / CN | |||
04 /
Wang, Chao P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU 100876, HAI DIAN District / CN | |||
05 /
Yang, Xianjun P.O. Box 92, No. 10, XI TU CHENG LU 100876, HAI DIAN District / CN | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/08] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10173447.3 | 19.08.2010 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | CN200910170940 | 21.08.2009 Original published format: CN200910170940 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2288049 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2288049 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2288049 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04L5/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2011/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Benutzerpaarung für Uplink-Mehrfachbenutzer-MIMO in einem koordinierten Mehrpunktübertragungsszenario | [2011/08] | English: | Method and device for user pairing for uplink multi-user MIMO under coordinated multiple point transmission scenario | [2011/08] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'appariement d'utilisateur pour MIMO multiutilisateur en liaison montante dans un scénario de transmission à plusieurs points coordonnés | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 27.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2010 | AL | 05.07.2017 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | IE | 19.08.2017 | LU | 19.08.2017 | MT | 19.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | GB | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GB | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GB | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GB | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GB | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GB | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GB | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GB | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GB | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2007171808 (WU JIANMING [CA], et al) [Y] 1,17,18 * paragraphs [0068] - [0077]; figures 11A, 11B, 12 * [A] 2-16; | [YA]US2009082028 (HOSEIN PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 1,17,18 * the whole document * [A] 2-16; | [A]WO2009083782 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [YA] - CMCC, "UL CoMP Scheme and System Level Performance Evaluation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090923, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090206), no. Athens, Greece; 20090206, XP050318764 [Y] 1,17,18 * page 1 - page 2 * [A] 2-16 | [YA] - HUAWEI, "Considerations on the Uplink Reference Signal for CoMP", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090819, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090203), no. Athens, Greece; 20090203, XP050318676 [Y] 1,17,18 * page 1 * [A] 2-16 | [A] - NORTEL, "UL MU-MIMO Performance Improvement for E-UTRA with SIC Receiver", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073301(NORTEL-UL V-MIMO WITH SIC), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070815), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20070820 - 20070824, XP050596456 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - BANDEMER B ET AL, "Capacity-Based Uplink Scheduling Using Long-Term Channel Knowledge", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2007 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC 2007), 24-28 JUNE 2007, GLASGOW, UK, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070601), ISBN 978-1-4244-0353-0, pages 785 - 790, XP031125767 [A] 1-18 * page 787 - page 788 * |