EP2372537 - Application portability and transfer of device management for mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alfano, Nicholas Patrick 44 Shelley Road Extension: 267014 Stratford-Upon-Avon, Warwickshire CV37 7JS / GB | 02 /
Carter, Jason Lee 1200 Sawgrass Corporate Way Extension: 68124 Sunrise, FL 33323 / US | 03 /
Clarke, David James 3460 161st Ave SE Extension: 60308 Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | 04 /
Ferrazzini, Axel Denis 47 Rue Forestiere Extension: 14589 1050, Brussels / BE | 05 /
Smith, Christopher David 4701 Tahoe Road Extension: 14305 Mississauga Ontario L4W 0B5 / CA | 06 /
Godfrey, James Andrew 440 Phillip Street Extension: 79377 Waterloo Ontario N2L 5R9 / CA | 07 /
Omar, Salim Hayder 419 Phillip Street Extension: 72857 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3X2 / CA | 08 /
Parry, Thomas Owen 185 Columbia Street W. Extension: 72813 Waterloo Ontario N2L 5Z5 / CA | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Electronics 20 Red Lion Street London, Greater London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10173761.7 | 23.08.2010 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | US20100823364 | 25.06.2010 Original published format: US 823364 | US20100320115P | 01.04.2010 Original published format: US 320115 P | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2372537 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, H04L12/24 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
G06F8/61 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anwendungsübertragbarkeit und Übertragung der Geräteverwaltung für mobile Geräte | [2011/40] | English: | Application portability and transfer of device management for mobile devices | [2011/40] | French: | Portabilité d'application et transfert de gestion de dispositif pour dispositifs mobiles | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 06.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004042509 (GALLANT JEAN-FRANCOIS [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] *; | [I]US2005027846 (WOLFE ALEX [US], et al) [I] 1-10,15 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0075]; figure 4 *; | [I]US2006047761 (KAPLAN ALAN [US], et al) [I] 11-14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A]WO2007084958 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 25 - page 9, line 2 *; | [A]US2008046880 (JUN HAE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A]US2008189419 (GIRLE DAVID ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014] * |