EP2299209 - Ice imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 M 63 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashrafzadeh, Farhad Patent Dept. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | 02 /
Chase, Kevin M. Patent Dept. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | 03 /
Janke, Brian P. Patent Dept. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | 04 /
Kanchanavally, Shreecharan Patent Dept. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | Application number, filing date | 10173813.6 | 24.08.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20090550722 | 31.08.2009 Original published format: US 550722 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2299209 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
F25C5/187 (EP,US);
F25C2400/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Eisabbildungssystem | [2011/12] | English: | Ice imaging system | [2011/12] | French: | Système d'imagerie de glace | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |