EP2299684 - Information providing method and apparatus, information display method and mobile terminal, program, and information providing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rekimoto, Junichi c/o Sony Computer Science Laboratories, Inc. Higashi-Gotanda Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 3-14-13 / JP | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstrasse 62 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard Partnerschaft Amalienstrasse 62 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Ealey, Douglas Ralph D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10174105.6 | 26.08.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | JP20090202264 | 02.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009202264 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299684 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32, H04N1/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
H04N1/00307 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/32101 (EP,US);
H04N1/32144 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsbereitstellungsverfahren und Vorrichtung, Informationsanzeigeverfahren und mobiles Endgerät, Programm und Informationsbereitstellungssystem | [2011/12] | English: | Information providing method and apparatus, information display method and mobile terminal, program, and information providing system | [2011/12] | French: | Procédé et appareil de fourniture d'informations, procédé d'affichage d'information et terminal mobile, programme et système de fourniture d'informations | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008076526 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005162523 (DARRELL TREVOR J [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * abstract *; | [A]WO2007021996 (EVRYX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 24 - page 25 *; | [A]WO0050919 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2008139295 |