EP2259368 - Battery, charging apparatus and electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | Battery, Charging Apparatus and Electronic Apparatus | ||
[2013/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamasaki, Takayoshi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Hiroaki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Toshiaki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Tomonori c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
Miyajima, Yoichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 06 /
Ishii, Masayuki c/o Sony Energy Devices Corporation 1-1 Aza-Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-Machi Koriyama-Shi Fukushima / JP | 07 /
Shintani, Shoichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 08 /
Sato, Yoshihiro c/o Sony Energy Devices Corporation 1-1 Aza-Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-Machi Koriyama-Shi, Fukushima / JP | [2014/02] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Yamasaki, Takayoshi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
02 /
Sato, Hiroaki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
03 /
Ueda, Toshiaki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
04 /
Watanabe, Tomonori c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
05 /
Miyajima, Yoichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
06 /
Ishii, Masayuki c/o Sony Energy Devices Corporation 1-1 Aza-Shimo Koriyama-Shi Fukushima / JP | |||
07 /
Shintani, Shoichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
08 /
Sato, Yoshihiro c/o Sony Energy Devices Corporation 1-1 Aza-Shimo Koriyama-Shi, Fukushima / JP | Representative(s) | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/49] | Mills, Julia D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10174199.9 | 26.12.2005 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | JP20040379986 | 28.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004379986 | JP20050035148 | 10.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005035148 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2259368 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2259368 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2259368 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/46, H01M2/30, H01M2/34 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
H01M50/55 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/553 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/46 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/10 (KR);
H01M50/597 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | H01M2/10, H01M10/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Batterie, Ladevorrichtung und elektronisches Gerät | [2010/49] | English: | Battery, charging apparatus and electronic apparatus | [2013/44] | French: | Batterie, appareil de chargement et appareil électronique | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/49] | Battery, Charging Apparatus and Electronic Apparatus | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 25.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05820165.8 / EP1835556 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050820165) is 06.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.12.2005 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | GB | 26.12.2014 | IE | 26.12.2014 | LU | 26.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
GB | 26.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
GB | 26.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
GB | 26.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
GB | 26.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 26.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 26.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 26.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0512515 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [A]US5208116 (JOH DEOK-SOON [KR]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,3; claims 1-3 * | by applicant | JPH0113692 | JP2508447B | JPH11307072 | JP2001076700 | JP2003317689 |