EP2289853 - Halogen generator for above ground pools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hui Wing Kin, Martin Room D, 1/F, Ho Fat Building 18 Sai Yu Street Yuen Long Hong Kong / CN | [2014/13] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Cupertino Instruments Limited 8A Hing Win Industrial Building 110 How Ming Street Kwun Tong Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hui, Wing-kin 8A Hing Win Industrial Building 110 How Ming Street Kwun Tong Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
Hui, Wing-tak 8A Hing Win Industrial Building 110 How Ming Street Kwun Tong Hong Kong / CN | [2014/18] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Hui, Wing-kin 8A Hing Win Industrial Building, 110 How Ming Street Kwun Tong Hong Kong / CN | ||
02 /
Hui, Wing-tak 8A Hing Win Industrial Building, 110 How Ming Street Kwun Tong Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10174400.1 | 27.08.2010 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US20090551185 | 31.08.2009 Original published format: US 551185 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2289853 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2289853 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2289853 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/461, C02F1/467, // C02F103/42 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
C02F1/4674 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46152 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46157 (EP,US);
C02F2103/42 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4611 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | C02F1/467, // C02F103/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Halogengenerator für oberirdisch installierte Schwimmbecken | [2011/09] | English: | Halogen generator for above ground pools | [2011/09] | French: | Générateur d'halogène pour piscines hors sol | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12157256.4 / EP2460769 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2010 | AL | 30.04.2014 | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | HR | 30.04.2014 | IT | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | MK | 30.04.2014 | MT | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | SM | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | NO | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | IE | 27.08.2014 | LU | 27.08.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 27.08.2010 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MK | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 27.08.2010 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.08.2010 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.08.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6096202 (FULMER PAUL F [US]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]US2004149663 (NAKANISHI MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2004108613 (BREMAUER BEN [AU]) [X] 1,3 * page 10, line 16 - page 14, line 21; figure - * [I] 2,4 | by applicant | US7014753 |