Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
08.10.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.10.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.03.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |