EP2422979 - Rotary printing press with central impression cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer & Krecke GmbH Hakenort 47 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitelaw, Gordon / 10, The Circle Bigola, NSW 2107 / AU | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 10174576.8 | 31.08.2010 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2422979 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F5/18, B41F5/24, B41F13/18, B41F33/00, B41F33/02 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
B41F13/14 (EP);
B41P2200/12 (EP);
B41P2213/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehdruckpresse mit zentralem Druckzylinder | [2012/09] | English: | Rotary printing press with central impression cylinder | [2012/09] | French: | Presse d'impression rotative avec cylindre d'impression centrale | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006060465 (FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102008035277 (FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2114937 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2055482 (COMEXI SA [ES]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2008049500 | WO2009112120 | WO2009074295 |