EP2302415 - Optical sensor device and method for operating an optical sensor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALLUFF GmbH Schurwaldstrasse 9 73765 Neuhausen / DE | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bronner, Manuel Johannes-Eisenlohr-Straße 86 72760 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
Forkl, Alexander Buchhartweg 41 73230 Kirchheim / DE | 03 /
Rieger, Tobias Dr.-Hofele-Straße 2 73550 Waldstetten / DE | [2015/44] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Bronner, Manuel Johannes-Eisenlohr-Straße 86 72760 Reutlingen / DE | ||
02 /
Forkl, Alexander Buchhartweg 41 73230 Kirchheim / DE | |||
03 /
Rieger, Tobias Dr.-Hofele-Straße 2 73550 Waldstetten / DE | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/44] |
Former [2011/13] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10174674.1 | 31.08.2010 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | DE20091029668 | 22.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009029668 | [2011/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2302415 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302415 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/00, G01S7/484 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
G01S7/484 (EP);
G01S17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2011/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Optische Sensorvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer optischen Sensorvorrichtung | [2011/13] | English: | Optical sensor device and method for operating an optical sensor device | [2011/13] | French: | Dispositif de capteur optique et procédé de fonctionnement d'un dispositif de capteur optique | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2010 | AL | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | ES | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | HR | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MK | 28.10.2015 | MT | 28.10.2015 | NL | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | SE | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | SM | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | NO | 28.01.2016 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
BG | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
MT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
MT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19855296 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,12 * column 2, line 53 - column 6, line 14; figures 1-10 * [I] 4-11,13-15; | [XI]DE10018948 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1, 7 * [I] 2-15; | [XA]DE102004002530 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12 * page 4, line 53 - page 4, line 60 * [A] 2-11,13-15; | [XA]DE102008014274 (FARO TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0016] *[A] 2-11,13-15 |