Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5670111B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2015 | B2 | JP2011077027 | 14.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009204891 | 04.09.2009 | JP2010168460 | 27.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2618360 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2014 | B1 | EP2618360 | 24.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009204891 | 04.09.2009 | EP10174782 | 01.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8416920 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2013 | B2 | US2011058655 | 10.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009204891 | 04.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102013378B | Global Dossier | 06.01.2016 | B | CN102013378 | 13.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009204891 | 04.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2293318 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | B1 | EP2293318 | 09.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009204891 | 04.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI497556B | 21.08.2015 | B | TW201137917 | 01.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009204891 | 04.09.2009 | Type | Divisional application | EP2618360 |