EP2293318 - Target for X-ray generation, X-ray generator, and method for producing target for X-ray generation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Electron Limited 3-1 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6325 / JP | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Tokyo Electron Limited 3-1 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6325 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okumura, Katsuya 22-1-103, Wakaba 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0011 / JP | 02 /
Kadosawa, Katsuji c/o Tokyo Electron Limited. 3-1 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6325 / JP | 03 /
Kiyomoto, Tomofumi 5-7-10, Ankojicho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1029 / JP | 04 /
Suyama, Motohiro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 05 /
Ishii, Atsushi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2013/24] |
Former [2013/21] | 01 /
Okumura, Katsuya 22-1-103, Wakaba 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
Kadosawa, Katsuji c/o Tokyo Electron Limited 3-1 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6325 / JP | |||
03 /
Kiyomoto, Tomofumi 5-7-10, Ankojicho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1029 / JP | |||
04 /
Suyama, Motohiro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
05 /
Ishii, Atsushi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Okumura, Katsuya 22-1-103, Wakaba 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
Kadosawa, Katsuji c/o Tokyo Electron Limited 3-1 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6325 / JP | |||
03 /
Kiyomoto, Tomofumi 5-7-10, Ankojicho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1029 / JP | |||
04 /
Suyama, Motohiro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
05 /
Ishii, Atsushi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10174782.2 | 01.09.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | JP20090204891 | 04.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009204891 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293318 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293318 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/12 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
H01J35/12 (EP,US);
H01J2235/081 (EP,US);
H01J2235/083 (EP,US);
H01J2235/1204 (EP,US);
H01J2235/1291 (EP,US);
H01J35/116 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Target zur Röntgenstrahlerzeugung, Röntgenstrahlgenerator und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Targets zur Röntgenstrahlerzeugung | [2011/10] | English: | Target for X-ray generation, X-ray generator, and method for producing target for X-ray generation | [2011/10] | French: | Cible pour génération de rayons X, générateur de rayons X et procédé de production de cible pour génération de rayons X | [2013/21] |
Former [2011/10] | Cible pour génération des rayons X, générateur de rayons X et procédé de production de cible pour génération des rayons X | Examination procedure | 03.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13002045.6 / EP2618360 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2010 | AL | 06.11.2013 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BE | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | ES | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | IT | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MK | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | NL | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | SM | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | NO | 06.02.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | |
NO | 06.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5148462 (SPITSYN BORIS [SU], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,10 * abstract * * column 3, lines 64-65 * * column 4, lines 39-66 * * column 5, lines 13-25 * * figures 3,5 * [I] 2,8; | [X]US2004165699 (RUSCH THOMAS W [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038]; figure 4 * | by applicant | JP2004028845 |