EP2258207 - Pasteurisation process for microbial cells and microbial oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaap, Albert Smitshoek 13 A 2993 BG, BARENDRECHT / NL | 02 /
Verkoejen, Daniel Bieremalaan 39 2497 AW, DEN HAAG / NL | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Elkenbracht, Johan Christiaan, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 130 6100 AC Echt / NL | ||
Former [2010/49] | Elkenbracht, Johan Christiaan, et al DSM Intellectual Property Office Delft PP 600-0240 P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 10174814.3 | 20.06.2003 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | EP20020254262 | 19.06.2002 Original published format: EP 02254262 | EP20020258713 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: EP 02258713 | [2010/49] | Previously filed application, date | EP20080157460 | 20.06.2003 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258207 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23D9/00, A23D9/02, A23K1/16, A23L1/30, C12N1/00, C12N1/12, C12N1/14, C12N1/16, C12N1/20, A23L1/29 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A23D9/00 (EP,US);
C12N1/005 (EP,KR,US);
C12P7/64 (EA);
A61L2/04 (KR,US);
A23D9/007 (KR);
A23D9/02 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,KR,US);
A23L31/15 (EA);
A23L33/115 (EP,EA,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/67 (EP,US);
A61K8/925 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/9706 (EP,US);
A61K8/9728 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07C57/03 (KR,US);
C11B1/10 (EP,KR,US);
C12P7/6427 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C12P7/6432 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C12P7/6434 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C12P7/6463 (EP,US);
C12P7/6472 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K2800/85 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Pasteurisationsverfahren für mikrobielle Zellen und Mikrobielles Öl | [2010/49] | English: | Pasteurisation process for microbial cells and microbial oil | [2010/49] | French: | Procédé de pasteurisation de cellules microbiennes et huile microbienne | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 05.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2014 | Observations by third parties | 18.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/21] | 18.04.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.05.2016 | 12.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03738077.1 / EP1513922 | EP08157460.0 / EP1970438 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030738077) is 25.08.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 23.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0522470 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [XD]WO9737032 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL], et al); | [XD]EP0986960 (DSM NV [NL]); | [X]US6255505 (BIJL HENDRIK LOUIS [NL], et al); | [X]EP1178103 (DSM NV [NL]); | by applicant | WO9737032 | other | EP1513922 |