EP2319839 - Quinazolinone derivatives and their use as CB agonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brain, Christopher, T. The Novartis Institute for Medical Sciences 5 Gower Place London, Greater London WC1E 6BN / GB | 02 /
Dziadulewicz, Edward, K. The Novartis Institute for Medical Sciences 5 Gower Place London, Greater London WC1E 6BS / GB | 03 /
Hart, Terance, W. The Novartis Institute for Medical Sciences 5 Gower Place London, Greater London WC1E 6BS / GB | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | von Sprecher, Georg Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | von Sprecher, Georg Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 10175740.9 | 05.02.2003 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | GB20020002755 | 06.02.2002 Original published format: GB 0202755 | GB20020013285 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: GB 0213285 | GB20020021460 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: GB 0221460 | GB20020021459 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: GB 0221459 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319839 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/91, A61K31/517, A61P29/00 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
C07D239/91 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | RO | 11.11.2011 | Title | German: | Chinazolinonderivate und deren Verwendung als CB Agonisten | [2011/19] | English: | Quinazolinone derivatives and their use as CB agonists | [2011/19] | French: | Dérivés de quinazolinone et leurs utilisations en tant qu'agonistes des récepteurs CB | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 12.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03737316.4 / EP1472234 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030737316) is 10.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2444671 (MASAYUKI ISHIKAWA [JP]) [X] 1,4-8 * page 1; examples 89-91; claim - *; | [X]EP0056637 (MASAYUKI ISHIKAWA [JP]) [X] 1,3-8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9323082 (ALCON LAB INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * page 1 - page 10; claims 1,10 *; | [A] - M. ISHIKAWA ET AL., "NEW HYPOTENSIVE AGENT", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN., PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO., JP, (1982), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 744 - 9, XP002240244 [A] 1,4-8 * page 744 - page 745 * |