EP2305349 - A programmable particle scatterer for radiation therapy beam formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mevion Medical Systems, Inc. 300 Foster Street Littleton, MA 01772 / US | [2012/13] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Still River Systems, Inc. 300 Foster Street Littleton, MA 01772 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sliski, Alan 273 Concord Road Lincoln, MA 01772 / US | 02 /
Gall, Kenneth 234 Massachusetts Avenue Havard, MA 01451 / US | [2013/14] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Sliski, Alan 273 Concord Road Lincoln, MA 01772 / US | ||
02 /
Gall, Kenneth 234 Massachusetts Avenue Havard, MA 01451 / US | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2011/14] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10175751.6 | 21.07.2005 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | US20040590088P | 21.07.2004 Original published format: US 590088 P | US20040949734 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: US 949734 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2305349 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2305349 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
A61N5/1077 (EP,US);
G21K1/08 (EP,US);
G21K5/04 (EP,US);
H05H7/00 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1087 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | Programmierbares Partikelstreuobjekt zur Gestaltung eines Strahlungstherapiestrahls | [2011/14] | English: | A programmable particle scatterer for radiation therapy beam formation | [2011/14] | French: | Diffuseur de particules programmable pour la formation de faisceau de radiothérapie | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05775000.2 / EP1796792 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050775000) is 18.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2005 | AT | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | IT | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | IE | 21.07.2013 | LU | 21.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5039867 (NISHIHARA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US5668371 (DEASY JOSEPH O [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 65 *; | [A]WO0126569 (ADVANCED RES & TECH INST [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6316776 (HIRAMOTO KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 30; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP1294445 (SCHWERIONENFORSCH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0055] - [0060]; figure - *; | [A]EP1153398 (SCHWERIONENFORSCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0055] - [0061] *; | [A] - CHU W T ET AL, "INSTRUMENTATION FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER USING PROTON AND LIGHT-ION BEAMS", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19930801), vol. 64, no. 8, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 2055 - 2122, XP000393868 [A] 1 * page 2069 - page 2072 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1143946 |