EP2266951 - Organic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baeschlin, Daniel, Kaspar Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 02 /
Maibaum, Jürgen, Klaus Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 03 /
Sellner, Holger Oberdorfstrasse 23 5033 Buchs / CH | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | von Sprecher, Georg Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | von Sprecher, Georg Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 10175765.6 | 25.11.2004 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US20030525374P | 26.11.2003 Original published format: US 525374 P | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2266951 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/20, C07D295/02, C07C237/24, C07C271/24, C07C323/29, C07C255/50, C07D319/18, C07D313/08, C07D307/79, C07D207/09, C07D333/08, A61P9/12, A61K31/165, A61K31/325, A61K31/44, A61K31/275, A61K31/357, A61K31/343, A61K31/5377, A61K31/402, A61K31/381 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
C07C237/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/40 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C237/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07C255/60 (EP,KR,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07C271/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07C323/41 (EP,KR,US);
C07D207/09 (EP,KR,US);
C07D295/027 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/79 (EP,KR,US);
C07D313/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07D319/18 (EP,US);
C07D333/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Extension states | AL | 29.06.2011 | HR | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | MK | 29.06.2011 | YU | 29.06.2011 | Title | German: | Organische Verbindungen | [2010/52] | English: | Organic compounds | [2010/52] | French: | Composés organiques | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04819222.3 / EP1689702 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040819222) is 03.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0678503 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-38 * RN 173334-44-6, 173335-70-1,173335-52-9, 173334-17-3,173338-25-5 , 173400-15-2, 173335-68-7, 173335-29-0 , 173335-30-3, 173335-86-9, 173399-95-6, 173337-74-1, 173334-72-0, 173335-85-8, 173335-76-7 *; | [X]WO0240007 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 31* the whole document *; | [XP]WO03103653 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-38 * RN 173334-44-6, 173335-70-1, 173335-52-9, 173334-17-3, 173335-68-7, 173400-15-2, 173335-29-0, 173399-95-6, 173335-86-9, 173335-85-8, 173334-72-0, 173335-76-7, 173338-25-5, 173335-30-3, 173337-74-1 *; | [X] - WOOD J M ET AL, "Structure-based design of aliskiren, a novel orally effective renin inhibitor", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20030905), vol. 308, no. 4, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 698 - 705, XP004447169 [X] 1,2,9-11,15,16,19,29-38 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(03)01451-7 | [X] - GÖSCHKE R ET AL, "Design and synthesis of novel 2,7-dialkyl substituted 5(S)-amino-4(S)-hydroxy-8-phenyl-octanecarboxamides as in vitro potent peptidomimetic inhibitors of human renin", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19971104), vol. 7, no. 21, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2735 - 2740, XP004136522 [X] 1,2,9-11,15,16,19,29-38 * page 2738; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(97)10067-1 | by applicant | EP0678514 | US5559111 | EP0678503 | - PATEL MONA, EXPERT OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2003), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 623 - 633 | - MALECZAK, JR.; SHI; HOLMES; SMITH, JAM CHEM SOC, (2003), vol. 125, no. 26, pages 7792 - 7793 |