EP2296453 - Self-cleaning chassis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Inc. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge New Jersey, DE 07920-2332 / US | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aggus, Trevor J. 14 Pine Street Lincroft, NJ 07738 / US | 02 /
Daniels, Helane F. 809 Andover Street Red Bank, NJ 07701 / US | 03 /
Derechailo, Linda 225 Kearney Street Keyport, NJ 07735 / US | 04 /
Jaccard, Richard 32 Harbour Road Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | 05 /
Kelbert, Roman Kalisher Street, 4 Rishon Lezion, 75754 / IL | 06 /
Mak, Steve 1 Longview Court Leonardo, NJ 07737 / US | 07 /
Truax, Charles 1102 Darlene Avenue Ocean, NJ 07712 / US | 08 /
Zilberman, Niv 82 Crystal Avenue West Orange, NJ 07751 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10175951.2 | 09.09.2010 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US20090557340 | 10.09.2009 Original published format: US 557340 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2296453 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2296453 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, G06F1/20 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
H05K7/20836 (EP,US);
G06F1/20 (EP,US);
G06F1/206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Selbstreinigende Karosserie | [2011/11] | English: | Self-cleaning chassis | [2011/11] | French: | Châssis autonettoyant | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 24.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002101714 (OSECKY BENJAMIN D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0032] * [I] 5,7-15; | [I]US2006092609 (MANDEL JOEL A [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3-6 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0051] *; | [I]US2007095522 (CHANG SHIH-CHI [TW]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2007131409 (ASAHI KAZUTOSHI [JP]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 6-7 * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] ** paragraphs [0028] - [0045] *; | [I]US2009009960 (MELANSON RONALD J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US7520444 (HALL CURTIS W [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 2,7 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 60 * * column 4, lines 30-60 * * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 52 * |