EP2294978 - Adaptive sampling of an electrocardiogram [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/11] | Adaptive sampling | ||
[2013/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yazicioglu, Refet Firat Brusselsestraat 175 bus 2 3000 Leuven / BE | [2013/36] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Yazicioglu, Refet Firat Brusselsestraat 175 bus 2 3000 Leuven / BE | Representative(s) | Mackett, Margaret, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Mackett, Margaret Dawn, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 10176639.2 | 14.09.2010 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US20090242299P | 14.09.2009 Original published format: US 242299 P | US20100365296P | 16.07.2010 Original published format: US 365296 P | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2294978 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2294978 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0428, A61B5/0456 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
A61B5/7239 (EP,US);
A61B5/366 (US);
A61B5/30 (EP);
A61B5/352 (EP,US);
A61B5/7225 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0209 (EP,US);
A61B5/7232 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | Adaptive Probenentnahme eines Elektrokardiogramms | [2013/14] | English: | Adaptive sampling of an electrocardiogram | [2013/14] | French: | Échantillonnage adaptatif d'un électrocardiogramme | [2013/14] |
Former [2011/11] | Adaptive Probenentnahme | ||
Former [2011/11] | Adaptive sampling | ||
Former [2011/11] | Échantillonnage adaptatif | Examination procedure | 19.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2010 | AL | 04.09.2013 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | HR | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MK | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | SM | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | IE | 14.09.2013 | LU | 14.09.2013 | NO | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MK | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.09.2013 | ||
LU | 14.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MK | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 14.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/29] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | |
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4669301 (KRATT ALFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1,6-10,15,17,18 * figures 2a,5,7 * * claims 1,4,7,10,18 * * column 4, line 47 - line 63 * * column 3, line 13 - line 40 * * column 5, line 1 - line 4 * * column 5, line 11 - line 13 * * column 5, line 27 - line 30 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 15 * [I] 19; | [XI]EP0540144 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-14,16-18 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 22 - line 49 * * column 3, line 15 - line 45 * [I] 19; | [I]WO2008073528 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [I] 1,6-10,17-19 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] ** figure 1 *; | [I] - RIEGER R ET AL, "A Signal Based Clocking Scheme for A/D Converters in Body Sensor Networks", TENCON 2006. 2006 IEEE REGION 10 CONFERENCE, IEEE, PI, (20061114), ISBN 978-1-4244-0548-0, pages 1 - 4, XP031333192 [I] 1-19 * figures 1-3 * * page 2 * | [A] - TRAKIMAS M ET AL, "A 0.8 V asynchronous ADC for energy constrained sensing applications", CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 2008. CICC 2008. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080921), ISBN 978-1-4244-2018-6, pages 173 - 176, XP031361437 [A] 1,9,10,17-19 * page 175 * | [I] - RIEGER R ET AL, "An Adaptive Sampling System for Sensor Nodes in Body Area Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL SYSTEMS AND REHABILITATIONENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20090401), vol. 17, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TNSRE.2008.2008648, ISSN 1534-4320, pages 183 - 189, XP011268188 [I] 1,6-10,15,17-19 * abstract * * page 183 - page 186 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNSRE.2008.2008648 | Examination | - BARR ET AL, Adaptive sampling of cardiac waveforms, JOURNAL OF ELECTROCARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, XX, PAGE(S) S57 - S60, (19880101), ISSN 0022-0736, XP022997235 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0736(88)90057-X | by applicant | EP0884851 | US7292168 | EP2086111 | - CC ENZ; GC TEMES, "Circuit Techniques for Reducing the Effects of Opamp Imperfections", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE, (199611), vol. 84, no. 11, pages 1584 - 1614 | - A-T AVESTRUZ; W SANTA; D CARLSON; R JENSEN; S STANSLASKI; A HELFENSTINE; T DENISON, "A 5pW/Channel Spectral Analysis IC for Chronic Bidirectional Brain-Machine Interfaces", IEEE J. OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (200812), vol. 43, no. 12, pages 3006 - 3024 | - RR HARRISON; C CHARLES, "A Low-Power Low-Noise CMOS Amplifier for Neural Recording Applications", IEEE J. OF SOLID STATE CIRCUITS, (200306), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 958 - 965 | - RF YAZICIOGLU; P MERKEN; B PUERS; C VAN HOOF, "A 200nW Eight-Channel EEG Acquisition ASIC for Ambulatory EEG Systems", IEE J. OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (200812), vol. 43, no. 12, pages 3025 - 3038 | - M TRAKIMAS; S SONKUSALE, "A 0.8V Asynchronous ADC for Energy Constrained Sensing Application", IEEE CICC, (200809), pages 173 - 176 | - I ROMERO ET AL., "Low-Power Robust Beat Detection in Ambulatory Cardiac Monitoring", IEEE BIOCAS, (200911), pages 249 - 252 | - XD ZOU; XY XU; LB YAO; Y LIAN, "A 1V 450nW Fully Integrated Programmable Biomedical Sensor Interface System", IEEE J. OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (200904), vol. 44, no. 4, pages 1067 - 1077 |