EP2267095 - Refrigerant composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RPL HOLDINGS LIMITED 8 Murieston Road Hale Altrincham Cheshire WA15 9ST / GB | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poole, John Edward Wynthorpe Murieston Road Hale Altrincham, Cheshire WA15 9ST / GB | 02 /
Powell, Richard 9 Sadlers Wells Bunbury, Cheshire CW6 9NW / GB | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds LS1 5BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10176706.9 | 28.02.2005 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | GB20040004343 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: GB 0404343 | [2010/52] | Previously filed application, date | EP20050717817 | 28.02.2005 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2267095 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2267095 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
C09K5/00 (KR);
C09K5/04 (KR);
C09K2205/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kühlmittelzusammensetzung | [2010/52] | English: | Refrigerant composition | [2010/52] | French: | Composition réfrigérante | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 18.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 15.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05717817.0 / EP1765953 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050717817) is 13.09.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0779352 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1,6-15* claim - *; | [XI]US6629419 (POWELL RICHARD L [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,6-15 * table 9, blend 3 * * claim - * [I] 3 |