EP2317359 - Lens device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Masumi David c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 1-324, Uetake-cho, Kita-ku, Saitama-shi Saitama / JP | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10176854.7 | 15.09.2010 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | JP20090251089 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009251089 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2317359 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/10 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
G02B7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Linsenvorrichtung | [2011/18] | English: | Lens device | [2011/18] | French: | Dispositif à lentille | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 20.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]EP1857850 (FUJINON CORP [JP]) [ID] 1,3,7-9 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0040] - [0043] * [A] 2,4-6; | [A]US2002135902 (NOMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1, 4, 8 * * paragraphs [0085] - [0089] *; | [A]US2009059390 (KOYAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * | by applicant | JP2007310228 | US2007268596 |