EP2309732 - Method and apparatus for displaying video signals from a plurality of input sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2017/22] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Sung-bo B-201, Seongdong Art 256-5, Woncheon-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Tae-hee 513-601, Seongnam-maeul Byeoksan Chelseavill Apt. Seongbok-dong, Suji-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Yoo, Young-taek 101-1905, Naru-maeul Hanwa Dream-Green Samsung Apt. Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jeon, Hyoung-woo 125-1002, Hyundai Hometown Apt., Maetan 1-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Park, Jae-ho 7-602, Dong-a Apt. Bupyeong-dong Bupyeong-gu Incheon / KR | 06 /
Yun, Na-rae A-816, Twin Park Officetel, 1134-4, Ingye-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/22] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
Oh, Sung-bo B-201, Seongdong Art 256-5, Woncheon-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Lee, Tae-hee 513-601, Seongnam-maeul Byeoksan Chelseavill Apt. Seongbok-dong, Suji-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Yoo, Young-taek 101-1905, Naru-maeul Hanwa Dream-Green Samsung Apt., Bansong-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Jeon, Hyoung-woo 125-1002, Hyundai Hometown Apt., Maetan 1-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Park, Jae-ho 7-602, Dong-a Apt., Bupyeong-dong, Bupyeong-gu Incheon / KR | |||
06 /
Yun, Na-rae A-816, Twin Park Officetel, 1134-4, Ingye-dong, Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2017/22] |
Former [2013/36] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2013/29] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2012/49] | Beck, Michaël Andries T Arnold Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2011/15] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 10177040.2 | 16.09.2010 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | KR20100006068 | 22.01.2010 Original published format: KR 20100006068 | US20090244492P | 22.09.2009 Original published format: US 244492 P | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2309732 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2309732 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N5/44, H04N7/12, G11B19/20 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
H04N21/42646 (EP,KR,US);
G09G5/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/43632 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/440263 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/44227 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2340/12 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2370/12 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2370/20 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2011/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Anzeige von Videosignalen aus mehreren Eingabequellen | [2011/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for displaying video signals from a plurality of input sources | [2011/15] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'affichage de signaux vidéo à partir d'une pluralité de sources d'entrée | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.12.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2010 | AL | 31.05.2017 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | IT | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | GB | 16.09.2017 | IE | 16.09.2017 | LU | 16.09.2017 | MT | 16.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | FR | 02.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 16.09.2010 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.09.2010 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.09.2010 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.09.2010 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.09.2010 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
MT | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005086687 (OMOIGUI NOSAKHARE D [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0068] * * figures 1-4,7,11 * [I] 3-15; | [I]US2005134739 (BIAN QIXIONG J [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2009153737 (GLEN DAVID I J [CA]) [X] 12,14,15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0104] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 1-11,13; | [A]JP2009188444 (CANON KK) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1-4 *; | [AP]EP2117231 (SONY CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039]; figure 4 ** paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055]; figure 2 * |