EP2263890 - Subframe for vehicle, and bush mounting arrangement therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Tsutomu c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Haruyuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Hori, Izuru c/o Honda Engineering Co., Ltd. 10-1, Shinsayama 1-chome Saitama-shi Saitama 350-1381 / JP | 04 /
Nagai, Yuichi c/o Honda Engineering Co., Ltd. 10-1, Shinsayama 1-chome Saitama-shi Saitama 350-1381 / JP | 05 /
Akiyama, Hiroshi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 06 /
Kimura, Kunihiko c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2014/11] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Ogawa, Tsutomu c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
Iwasaki, Haruyuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
Hori, Izuru c/o Honda Engineering Co., Ltd. 10-1, Shinsayama 1-chome Saitama-shi Saitama 350-1381 / JP | |||
04 /
Nagai, Yuichi c/o Honda Engineering Co., Ltd. 10-1, Shinsayama 1-chome Saitama-shi Saitama 350-1381 / JP | |||
05 /
Akiyama, Hiroshi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
06 /
Kimura, Kunihiko c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Prechtel, Jörg Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Prechtel, Jörg Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10177412.3 | 29.03.2005 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | JP20040102133 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004102133 | JP20040102969 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004102969 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2263890 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2263890 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60G3/20, B60G7/02, B62D21/11, B62D25/08 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B60G7/02 (EP,US);
B60G3/20 (EP,US);
B62D21/11 (EP,US);
B62D25/082 (EP,US);
B60G2200/144 (EP,US);
B60G2200/4622 (EP,US);
B60G2204/143 (EP,US);
B60G2204/15 (EP,US);
B60G2204/19 (EP,US);
B60G2204/41 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4302 (EP,US);
B60G2206/604 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/51] | Title | German: | Hilfsrahmen für Fahrzeug und Hülsengummifeder-Einbau dafür | [2010/51] | English: | Subframe for vehicle, and bush mounting arrangement therefor | [2010/51] | French: | Berceau de véhicule et arrangement d'un manchon pour ce dernier | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05721705.1 / EP1686042 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050721705) is 11.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.05.2014 | GB | 12.06.2014 | [2015/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2582775 (DANTE GIACOSA) [A] 1-3* figure 7 *; | [X]JPH0867269 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]EP1266773 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0018] *; | [E]US2007278778 (TANAKA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [E] 1-3 * paragraph [0059]; figure 4 * | by applicant | JP2601866Y | JP2003146240 |