EP2308315 - SQUEEZING DEVICE OF AN ANIMAL INTESTINE CLEANING LINE, AND RUNOFF PLATE FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/15] | Squeezing device of an animal intestine cleaning line, and runoff plate for same | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holdijk & Haamberg GmbH Kaisersteige 260 48599 Gronau / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Firma Holdijk & Haamberg GmbH Kaiserstiege 260 48599 Gronau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holdijk, Arend Wilgenkampweg 75 7547 RZ, Enschede / NL | [2016/30] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
Holdijk, Arend Wilgenkampweg 75 7547RZ, Enschede / NL | Representative(s) | Habbel, Ludwig Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2011/15] | Habbel, Ludwig Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 10177511.2 | 18.09.2010 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | DE20091044188 | 06.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009044188 | DE20101000463 | 18.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010000463 | [2011/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2308315 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2308315 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308315 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A22C17/14 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
A22C17/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2011/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | QUETSCHEINRICHTUNG EINER TIERDARM-REINIGUNGSLINIE, SOWIE ABLAUFBLECH DAFÜR | [2016/11] | English: | SQUEEZING DEVICE OF AN ANIMAL INTESTINE CLEANING LINE, AND RUNOFF PLATE FOR SAME | [2016/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COINCEMENT D'UNE LIGNE DE NETTOYAGE D'INTESTIN ANIMAL ET TÔLE D'ÉCOULEMENT CORRESPONDANTE | [2016/11] |
Former [2011/15] | Quetscheinrichtung einer Tierdarm-Reinigungslinie, sowie Ablaufblech dafür | ||
Former [2011/15] | Squeezing device of an animal intestine cleaning line, and runoff plate for same | ||
Former [2011/15] | Dispositif de coincement d'une ligne de nettoyage d'intestin animal et tôle d'écoulement correspondante | Examination procedure | 14.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 17.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2010 | AL | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | MT | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | AT | 18.09.2016 | IE | 18.09.2016 | LU | 18.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | FR | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 18.09.2010 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 18.09.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
LU | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.09.2010 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 18.09.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
LU | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.09.2010 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 18.09.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
LU | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 18.09.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
LU | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
LU | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0514693 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012]; figure 4 *; | [AD]GB877314 (KONTROLLHUDAR ANDELSSLAKTERIER) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US1077488 (OLSEN AKSEL [NO]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE856856 | GB877314 |