EP2263924 - Aircraft brake actuation system including anti-hysteresis control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Paul Honeywell International Inc Patent Services M/S - AB/2B P.O.Box 22445 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Quitmeyer, James 3871 S Barberry Place Chandler, AZ 85248 / US | [2011/38] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Evans, Paul 4284 E Reins Road Gilbert, AZ 85297 / US | ||
02 /
Quitmeyer, James 3871 S Barberry Place Chandler, AZ 85248 / US | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10177791.0 | 18.11.2005 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | US20040993608 | 19.11.2004 Original published format: US 993608 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2263924 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2263924 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17, B60T13/74, B60T8/32 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B60T8/1703 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/51] | Title | German: | Hysteresisfreies Bremssteuerungsystem für ein Flugzeug | [2010/51] | English: | Aircraft brake actuation system including anti-hysteresis control | [2010/51] | French: | Système de commande de freinage sans hystérésis pour aéronef | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/51] | Systèm de commande de freinage sans hystérésis pour aéronef | Examination procedure | 10.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 22.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05257129.6 / EP1661780 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050257129) is 27.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6480130 (HANSON MARK B [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 8 - line 57 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US4078845 (AMBERG ROBERT LEO, et al) [A] 1,10 * claim 28 * | by applicant | US4078845 | US6480130 |