EP2431500 - Regeneration of zinc nickel alkali electrolytes by removing cyanide ions by using soluble quarternary ammonium compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. Max Schlötter GmbH & Co. KG Talgraben 30 73312 Geislingen/Steige / DE | [2013/01] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. Max Schlötter GmbH & Co. KG Am Talgraben 30 73312 Geislingen/Steige / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krauß, Dipl.-Ing. Ralph Landhausweg 4 73560, Böbingen / DE | 02 /
Jordan, Dr. Manfred Panoramastr. 36 73084, Salach / DE | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10177852.0 | 21.09.2010 | [2012/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431500 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2431500 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/24, C25D21/06, C25D21/18 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
C25D21/06 (EP);
C25D21/18 (EP);
C25D3/24 (EP);
C25D3/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | Regeneration alkalischer Zinknickelelektrolyte durch Entfernen von Cyanidionen mit Hilfe von löslichen quartären Ammoniumverbindungen | [2012/12] | English: | Regeneration of zinc nickel alkali electrolytes by removing cyanide ions by using soluble quarternary ammonium compounds | [2012/12] | French: | Régénération d'électrolytes alcalins en nickel-zinc par suppression de cyanidions à l'aide de composés solubles d'ammonium quaternaire | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2010 | AL | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MK | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | SM | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | IE | 21.09.2013 | LU | 21.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 21.09.2010 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MK | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
LU | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MK | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 03.04.2013 | |
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1603446 (OXY METAL INDUSTRIES CORP) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,5 * * page 1, lines 17-25 * * page 2, lines 8-25 *; | [A]US2436316 (LUM JOHN C, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 4, lines 18-58 *; | [A]DE102008058086 (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0026] * * pages 9,10; tables 8,9 * | [A] - WANG K, "CONVERSION OF CYANIDE-CONTAINING TO CYANIDE-FREE SILVER ELECTROPLATING SOLUTION USING AMMONIUM THIOSULFATE", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE (C A S), US, (19881001), vol. 109, no. 18, ISSN 0009-2258, page 623, XP000018711 [A] 1-12 * abstract * |