EP2295619 - Process for producing Low Defect Density Silicon Having a Vacancy-Dominated Core Substantially Free of Oxidation Induced Stacking Faults [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/11] | Low Defect Density Silicon Having A Vacancy-Dominated Core Substantially Free of Oxidation Induced Stacking Faults | ||
[2013/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O. Box 8 St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | [2014/17] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O. Box 8 St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Chang Bum C/o MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O.Box 8 St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 02 /
Kimbel, Steven L C/o MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O.Box 8 St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 03 /
Libbert, Jeffrey L C/o MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O.Box 8 St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 04 /
Banan, Mohsen C/o MEMC 501 Pearl Drive P.O. Box 8 St. Peters, 63376 / US | [2014/17] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Kim, Chang Bum C/o MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O.Box 8 St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | ||
02 /
Kimbel, Steven L C/o MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O.Box 8 St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | |||
03 /
Libbert, Jeffrey L C/o MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O.Box 8 St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | |||
04 /
Banan, Mohsen C/o MEMC 501 Pearl Drive P.O. Box 8 St. Peters, 63376 / US | Representative(s) | Parchmann, Stefanie, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Parchmann, Stefanie, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10177865.2 | 22.01.2002 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US20010264415P | 26.01.2001 Original published format: US 264415 P | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295619 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2295619 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/06, C30B15/20 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
C30B15/203 (EP,US);
C30B15/00 (KR);
C30B15/20 (EP,US);
C30B15/206 (EP,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Silizium mit niedriger Defektdichte und mit leerstellendominiertem Kern, der im wesentlichen frei von oxidationsinduzierten Stapelfehlern ist | [2014/17] | English: | Process for producing Low Defect Density Silicon Having a Vacancy-Dominated Core Substantially Free of Oxidation Induced Stacking Faults | [2013/30] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de silicium a faible densite de defauts dont la partie centrale dominee par des lacunes est pratiquement exempte de defauts d'empilement induits par oxydation | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/11] | Silizium mit niedriger defektdichte und mit leerstellendominiertem Kern, das im wesentlichen frei von oxidationsinduzierten Stapelfehlern ist | ||
Former [2011/11] | Low Defect Density Silicon Having A Vacancy-Dominated Core Substantially Free of Oxidation Induced Stacking Faults | ||
Former [2011/11] | Silicium a faible densite de defauts dont la partie centrale dominee par des lacunes est pratiquement exempte de defauts d'empilement induits par oxydation | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 05.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02714762.8 / EP1356139 | EP06111930.1 / EP1688519 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020714762) is 24.01.2005 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.04.2014 | GB | 22.01.2015 | [2015/48] |
Former [2015/18] | IT | 23.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9845508 (MEMC ELECTRONIC MATERIALS [US]) [X] 1-24 * claims 1,2,11-15 *; | [X]JPH1143397 ; | [A]JPH1143396 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 5, & JP11043397 A 19990216 (NIPPON STEEL CORP;NITTETSU DENSHI KK) [X] 1-24 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 5, & JP11043396 A 19990216 (NIPPON STEEL CORP;NITTETSU DENSHI KK) [A] 1-24 * abstract * |