EP2301787 - Accelerator pedal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mikuni Corporation 13-11 Sotokanda 6-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osawa, Tsuyoshi@c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kumamoto, Masato@c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Fukushima, Yoshitomo@c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Kikuchi, Kouji@c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Shimizu, Tsuyoshi@c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Kawade, Hisashi@c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 07 /
Touhachi, Hiromutsu@c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Osawa, Tsuyoshi c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Kumamoto, Masato c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Fukushima, Yoshitomo c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Kikuchi, Kouji c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
05 /
Shimizu, Tsuyoshi c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
06 /
Kawade, Hisashi c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
07 /
Touhachi, Hiromutsu c/o Mikuni Corporation 2480 Kuno, Odawara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10177919.7 | 21.09.2010 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | JP20090218656 | 24.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009218656 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301787 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2301787 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K26/02, G05G1/30, G05G1/38, G05G5/03 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
B60K26/021 (EP,US);
G05G1/38 (EP,US);
G05G1/44 (EP,US);
G05G5/03 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20528 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20534 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20888 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Gaspedalvorrichtung | [2011/13] | English: | Accelerator pedal apparatus | [2011/13] | French: | Appareil de pédale d'accélérateur | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 14.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2010 | AL | 05.09.2012 | AT | 05.09.2012 | BE | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | IT | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MK | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | SM | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | IE | 21.09.2012 | LU | 21.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 05.11.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 21.09.2010 | |
AL | 05.09.2012 | ||
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
LU | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 05.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
LU | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 05.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 05.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AL | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 05.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 05.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 05.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2172358 (MIKUNI KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0025] - [0029] - [0033] - [0036] - [0045] - [0050]; figure 4 *; | [A]DE102004025829 (A B ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] - [0041] - [0050] - [0054] *; | [A]DE19848087 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 27; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | DE102004025829 | EP2172358 |