EP2259434 - Slim line battery pack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Infanti, James 569 Waterton Court Waterloo Ontario N2V 2K5 / CA | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10178100.3 | 02.06.2004 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2259434 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2259434 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, H01M2/10, // H04M1/02 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
H04B1/3883 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H04M1/0262 (EP);
H01M10/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Extension states | AL | 18.02.2011 | HR | 18.02.2011 | LT | 18.02.2011 | LV | 18.02.2011 | MK | 18.02.2011 | Title | German: | Dünnes Batteriepack | [2010/49] | English: | Slim line battery pack | [2010/49] | French: | Bloc batterie mince | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2013 | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/14] | 24.11.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 26.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04102469.6 / EP1603246 | EP07101759.4 / EP1775845 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040102469) is 03.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003187765 (SANYO GS SOFT ENERGY CO LTD) [A] 15* abstract *; | [XI]EP1403942 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0072] * * figures 8, 9 * [I] 3-8,14,15 | Examination | EP1320137 | by applicant | US6529714 | US2003157408 |