EP2434360 - Motion control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möhring, Rainer Feldhofstrasse 22 97520 Röthlein / DE | 02 /
Schlinkert, Jochen Alleestrasse 4 3703 Aeschi / CH | 03 /
Vollmann, Jörg Ringstrasse 29 91325 Adelsdorf / DE | 04 /
Wagner, Peter Kellerstrasse 7 91217 Hersbruck / DE | [2019/38] |
Former [2012/13] | 01 /
Möhring, Rainer Feldhofstrasse 22 97520 Röthlein / DE | ||
02 /
Schlinkert, Jochen Alleestrasse 4 3703 Aeschi / CH | |||
03 /
Vollmann, Jörg Ringstrasse 29 Adelsdorf / DE | |||
04 /
Wagner, Peter Kellerstrasse 7 91217 Hersbruck / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/13] | Application number, filing date | 10178336.3 | 22.09.2010 | [2012/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2434360 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2434360 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/414 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
G05B19/4148 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25472 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35291 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2012/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bewegungssteuerungssystem | [2012/13] | English: | Motion control system | [2012/13] | French: | Système de contrôle de mouvement | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2010 | AL | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | AT | 22.09.2020 | GB | 22.09.2020 | IE | 22.09.2020 | LU | 22.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
AT | 22.09.2020 | ||
GB | 22.09.2020 | ||
IE | 22.09.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
AT | 22.09.2020 | ||
GB | 22.09.2020 | ||
IE | 22.09.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
AT | 22.09.2020 | ||
GB | 22.09.2020 | ||
IE | 22.09.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
AT | 22.09.2020 | ||
GB | 22.09.2020 | ||
IE | 22.09.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
GB | 22.09.2020 | ||
IE | 22.09.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 22.09.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5774377 (EIDSON JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2006042799 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10,11 * page 2, line 26 - page 7, line 5 * * page 8, lines 5-14 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3,7; | [XI]DE102004052555 (BOSCH REXROTH AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,7-9; | [XI]EP1768006 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 5,7,9; | [XI]EP1892598 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,11 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 3,5,7; | [A]DE102007015762 (IT DESIGNERS GMBH [DE]) [A] 9* the whole document * |