EP2431226 - Rear view device for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMR Patents S.à.r.l. Le Dôme 2-8 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states SMR Patents S.à.r.l. Le Dôme 2-8 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | ||
For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states SMR Patents S.à.r.l. Le Dôme 2-8 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hottmann, Philipp Robert-Leicht-Str. 94 70563, Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Heinemann, Patrick Sudetenstrasse 11a 85092 Kösching / DE | 03 /
Liepold, Markus Lindberghstrasse 49 85092 Ingolstadt / DE | 04 /
Prücklmeier, Andreas Sängerweg 4 93080 Pentling / DE | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/12] | 01 /
Hottmann, Philipp Robert-Leicht-Str. 94 70563, Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, et al Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2012/12] | Application number, filing date | 10178378.5 | 22.09.2010 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | EP20100177322 | 17.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10177322 | [2012/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431226 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2431226 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/00 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
B60R1/26 (EP,US);
H04N7/183 (US);
B60R1/006 (US);
B60R2300/105 (EP,US);
B60R2300/408 (EP,US);
B60R2300/607 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2012/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rückblickeinrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2012/12] | English: | Rear view device for a motor vehicle | [2012/12] | French: | Dispositif de rétroviseur pour un véhicule automobile | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 03.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2010 | AL | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | MT | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | AT | 22.09.2016 | IE | 22.09.2016 | LU | 22.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 22.09.2016 | ||
IE | 22.09.2016 | ||
LU | 22.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 22.09.2016 | ||
IE | 22.09.2016 | ||
LU | 22.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 22.09.2016 | ||
IE | 22.09.2016 | ||
LU | 22.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 22.09.2016 | ||
IE | 22.09.2016 | ||
LU | 22.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.09.2016 | ||
LU | 22.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 22.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004230358 (STAM JOSEPH S [US], et al) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046]; figures 5a-7a *; | [X]WO2006018951 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * zu Abb. 5-7 entsprechende Teilen der Beschreibung;; figures 5-7 *; | [X]US2010039494 (HORIHATA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0337] - paragraph [0370]; figures 15-21 * | by applicant | DE10043099 | DE69709810T | DE69618192T | DE102007054342 |