EP2261371 - NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, NL, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QIAGEN GmbH Qiagen Strasse 1 40724 Hilden / DE | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lasken, Roger S. c/o The Institute for Genomic Research J. Craig Venter Institute 9704 Medical Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 02 /
Egholm, Michael 8 Dogwood Court Woodbridge, CT 06525 / US | 03 /
Bornarth, Carole 99 Mohawk Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | 04 /
Wisniewski, Michele 8302 Town Walk Drive Hamden, CT 06518 / US | 05 /
Hosono, Seiyu 140 New Street, Apt. 2315 Mamaroneck, NY 10543 / US | 06 /
Raghunathan, Arumugham 80 Brentwood Drive Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | 07 /
Alsmadi, Osama A. 310 Glenwood Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | [2012/24] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Lasken, Roger S. c/o The Institute for Genomic Research, J. Craig Venter Institute, 9704 Medical Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | ||
02 /
Egholm, Michael 8 Dogwood Court 06525, CT Woodbridge / US | |||
03 /
Bornarth, Carole 99 Mohawk Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | |||
04 /
Wisniewski, Michele 8302 Town Walk Drive Hamden, CT 06518 / US | |||
05 /
Hosono, Seiyu 140 New Street, Apt. 2315 Mamaroneck, NY 10543 / US | |||
06 /
Raghunathan, Arumugham 80 Brentwood Drive Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | |||
07 /
Alsmadi, Osama A. 310 Glenwood Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | Application number, filing date | 10178502.0 | 19.12.2003 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | US20020327602 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 327602 | US20030429229 | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 429229 | US20030456056 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: US 456056 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2261371 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2261371 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261371 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C07H21/04 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6844 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2531/119 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2010/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NUKLEINSÄUREAMPLIFIKATION | [2010/50] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION | [2010/50] | French: | AMPLIFICATION DE L'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 15.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03799976.0 / EP1583843 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030799976) is 22.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2003 | AT | 22.07.2015 | BE | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | NL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | IE | 19.12.2015 | LU | 19.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
BE | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
GR | 23.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5455166 (WALKER GEORGE T [US]) [I] 1-12 * columns 4-14 *; | [I]WO9918241 (UNIV YALE [US]) [I] 1-12 * pages 3-37 *; | [I]US6033881 (HIMMLER GOTTFRIED [AT], et al) [I] 1-12* columns 3-22 *; | [I] - DETTER J C ET AL, "Isothermal strand-displacement amplification applications for high-throughput genomics", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (20021201), vol. 80, no. 6, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 691 - 698, XP002310697 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | [I] - WALKER G T ET AL, "MULTIPLEX STRAND DISPLACEMENT AMPLIFICATION (SDA) AND DETECTION OF DNA SEQUENCES FROM MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS AND OTHER MYCOBACTERIA", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19940711), vol. 22, no. 13, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2670 - 2677, XP000198998 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | [I] - CALIN ANDRAS S ET AL, "STRATEGIES FOR SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION IN NUCLEIC ACID DETECTION", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, TOTOWA, NJ, US, (2001), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 29 - 44, XP001031378 [I] 1-12 * pages 32-33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/MB:19:1:029 | by applicant | US3687808 | US4469863 | US4476301 | EP0070685 | US4845205 | US4981957 | US5001050 | US5023243 | US5034506 | US5043272 | US5118800 | US5130302 | US5134066 | US5166315 | US5175273 | US5177196 | US5185444 | US5188897 | US5198543 | US5214134 | US5216141 | US5235033 | US5264423 | US5264562 | US5264564 | US5276019 | US5278302 | US5286717 | US5319080 | US5321131 | US5359044 | US5367066 | US5393878 | US5399676 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5446137 | US5451067 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5466786 | US5466677 | US5470967 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5489677 | US5502177 | US5514785 | US5519134 | US5519126 | US5525711 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541306 | US5541307 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5563037 | US5567811 | US5571799 | US5576427 | US5587469 | US5587361 | US5591722 | US5594121 | US5596091 | US5596086 | US5597909 | US5602240 | US5608046 | US5610300 | US5610289 | US5614617 | US5618704 | US5623070 | US5625050 | US5627053 | WO9717471 | WO9717076 | US5633360 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5658873 | US5663312 | US5670633 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5681941 | US5700920 | US5714331 | US5719262 | US6124120 | US6143495 | US6214587 | US6287768 | US6288220 | US6287776 | US6291193 | US6291669 | US6294664 | US6297006 | US6312902 | US6440707 | US6458544 | US6472185 | US6479244 | US6679242 | - BIRKENMEYER; MUSHAHWAR, J. VIROLOGICAL METHODS, (1991), vol. 35, pages 117 - 126 | - LANDEGREN, TRENDS GENETICS, (1993), vol. 9, pages 199 - 202 | - TELENIUS ET AL., GENOINICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 718 - 725 | - CHEUNG; NELSON, PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (1996), vol. 93, pages 14676 - 14679 | - ZHANG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U SA., (1992), vol. 89, pages 5847 - 5851 | - LOCKHART ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 1675 - 1680 | - TENOVER ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1994), vol. 32, pages 407 - 415 | - PRUCKLER ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 33, pages 2872 - 2875 | - LANTZ ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. ANNU. REV., (2000), vol. 5, pages 87 - 130 | - ENGLISCH ET AL., Angewandte Chemie, (1991), vol. 30, page 613 | - SANGHVI, Y. S., Antisense Research and Applications, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 289 - 302 | - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - SCHWEITZER; KINGSMORE, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECH., (2001), vol. 12, pages 21 - 27 | - HALL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 8272 - 8277 | - HOLLAND ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7276 - 7280 | - NAZERENLCO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 2516 - 2521 | - THELWELL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, no. 19, pages 3752 - 3761 | - LITTLE ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1999), vol. 45, pages 777 - 784 | - PEASE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, no. 11, pages 5022 - 5026 | - KHRAPKO ET AL., MOL BIOL (MOSK) (ZISSR), (1991), vol. 25, pages 718 - 730 | - STIMPSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 6379 - 6383 | - GUO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 5456 - 5465 | - SCHENA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 487 - 470 | - TYAGI; KRAMER, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, page 303 | - HOY; SCHIMKE, MUTATION RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 290, pages 217 - 230 | - HENEGARIU ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 18, pages 345 - 348 | - SANO ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1988), vol. 951, pages 157 - 165 | - WANSICK ET AL., J. CELL BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 122, pages 283 - 293 | - LANGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 6633 | - KERKHOF, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 205, pages 359 - 364 | - YU ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 3226 - 3232 | - TYAGI; KRAMER, NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1995), vol. 14, pages 303 - 309 | - S. L. BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1981), vol. 22, page 1859 | - R. C. PLESS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1975), vol. 2, page 773 | - M. D. MATTEUCCI, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1981), vol. 103, page 3185 | - R. L. LETSINGER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1976), vol. 9, page 3655 | - R.P. IYER; W. EGAN; J.B. REGAN; S.L. BEAUCAGE, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, pages 1253 - 1254 | - HALL ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., (1957), pages 3291 - 3296 | - IKUTA ET AL., ANFA. REV. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 53, pages 323 - 356 | - NARANG ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1980), vol. 65, pages 610 - 620 | - NIELSEN ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 3 - 7 | - LESNICK; FREIER, BIOCLAEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 34, pages 10807 - 10815 | - MCGRAW ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1990), vol. 8, pages 674 - 678 | - RYCHLIK ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 6409 - 6412 | - ALIOTTA ET AL., GENET. ANAL. (NETHERLANDS), (1996), vol. 12, pages 185 - 195 | - WALKER; LINN, CLINICAL CHEMIST7Y, (1996), vol. 42, pages 1604 - 1608 | - MATSUMOTO ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 84, page 247 | - JUNG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, page 8287 | - KONG ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 1965 - 1975 | - JACOBSEN ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1974), vol. 45, pages 623 - 627 | - CHATTERJEE ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 97, pages 13 - 19 | - ZHU; ITO, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1994), vol. 1219, pages 267 - 276 | - KABOORD; BENKOVIC, CURRO BIOL., (1995), vol. 5, pages 149 - 157 | - TSURUMI ET AL., J. VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 67, no. 12, pages 7648 - 7653 | - ZIJDERVELD; VAN DER VLIET, J. VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 68, no. 2, pages 1158 - 1164 | - BOEHMER; LEHMAN, J. VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 67, no. 2, pages 711 - 715 | - SKALITER; LEHMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, no. 22, pages 10665 - 10669 | - RIGLER; ROMANO, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 8910 - 8919 | - VILLEMAIN; GIEDROC, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 14395 - 14404 | - SIEGEL ET AL., J. BIOL. CLIEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 13629 - 13635 | - KONG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 1965 - 1975 | - ZHANG ET AL., PLOC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 5847 - 5851 | - TELENIUS ET AL., GENOMICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 718 - 725 | - CHEUNG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 14676 - 14679 | - KUKASJAARVI ET AL., GENES, CHROMOSOMES AND CANCER, (1997), vol. 18, pages 94 - 101 | - YU ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDES RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 3226 - 3232 | - LANGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1981), vol. 78, pages 6633 - 37 | - SPEICHER ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1996), vol. 12, pages 368 - 375 | - ERNST ET AL., CYTOMETRY, (1989), vol. 10, pages 3 - 10 | - MUJUMDAR ET AL., CYTOMETRY, (1989), vol. 10, pages 11 - 19 | - YU, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 3226 - 3232 | - WAGGONER, METH. ENZZYMOLOGY, (1995), vol. 246, pages 362 - 373 | - "Southern, Detection of specific sequences among DNA fragments separated by gel electrophoresis", JMOL BIOL., (1975), vol. 98, pages 503 - 517 | - ZHANG ET AL., "Whole genome amplification from a single cell: implications for genetic analysis", PROC NATL ACAD SCI US A., (1992), vol. 89, pages 5847 - 5851 | - FARUQI ET AL., "High-Throughput Genotyping of Single Nucleotide Polymorphisms with Rolling Circle Amplification", BMC GENOMICS, (2001), vol. 2, page 4 | - ZHANG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1992), vol. 89, pages 5847 - 5851 | - CHEUNG; NELSON, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1996), vol. 93, pages 14676 - 14679 | - PAUNIO ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1996), vol. 42, pages 1382 - 1390 | - BLANCO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 8935 - 8940 | - CHEUNG; NELSON, "Whole genome amplification using a degenerate oligonucleotide primer allows hundreds of genotypes to be performed on less than one nanogram of genomic DNA", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1996), vol. 93, pages 14676 - 14679 | - KIM ET AL., "Whole genome amplification and molecular genetic analysis of DNA from paraffin-embedded prostate adenocarcinoma tumor tissue", J UROL., (1999), vol. 162, pages 1512 - 1518 | - KLEIN ET AL., "Comparative genomic hybridization, loss of heterozygosity, and DNA sequence analysis of single cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 4494 - 4499 | - WELLS ET AL., "Detailed chromosomal and molecular genetic analysis of single cells by whole genome amplification and comparative genomic hybridization", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1999), vol. 27, pages 1214 - 1218 | - ESTEBAN ET AL., "Fidelity of Phi29 DNA polymerase. Comparison between protein-primed initiation and DNA polymerization", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 2719 - 2726 | - ECKERT; KUNKEL, "DNA polymerase fidelity and the polymerase chain reaction", PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, (1991), vol. 1, pages 17 - 24 | - SAIKI ET AL., "Primer-directed enzymatic amplification of DNA with a thermostable DNA polymerase", SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 487 - 491 | - HARPER; WELLS, "Recent advances and future developments in PGD", PRENAT DIAGN., (1999), vol. 19, pages 1193 - 1199 | - WELLS; DELHANTY, "Comprehensive chromosomal analysis of human preimplantation embryos using whole genome amplification and single cell comparative genomic hybridization", MOL HUM REPROD., (2000), vol. 6, pages 1055 - 1062 | - PAULSON ET AL., "Loss of heterozygosity analysis using whole genome amplification, cell sorting, and fluorescence-based PCR", GENOME RES., (1999), vol. 9, pages 482 - 491 | - GILLESPIE ET AL., "HLA class II typing of whole genome amplified mouth swab DNA", TISSUE ANTIGENS, (2000), vol. 56, pages 530 - 538 | - BUCHANAN ET AL., "Long DOP-PCR of rare archival anthropological samples", HUM BIOL., (2000), vol. 72, pages 911 - 925 | - GUILLIER-GENCIK ET AL., "Generation of whole-chromosome painting probes specific to each chicken macrochromosome", CYTOGENET CELL GENET., (1999), vol. 87, pages 282 - 285 | - TELENIUS ET AL., GERAORRAICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 718 - 725 | WO2003AU01110 |