EP2292619 - Purine derivatives for use as adenonsin A-2A receptor agonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fairhurst, Robin Alec Novartis Horsham Research Center Wimblehurst Road Horsham, Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 02 /
Taylor, Roger John Novartis Horsham Research Center Wimblehurst Road Horsham, Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 03 /
Singh, Paul Novartis Horsham Research Center Wimblehurst Road Horsham, Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | von Sprecher, Georg Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | von Sprecher, Georg Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 10178514.5 | 21.10.2005 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | GB20040023551 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: GB 0423551 | GB20050014619 | 15.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0514619 | [2011/10] | Previously filed application, date | WO2005EP11344 | 21.10.2005 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292619 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/16, C07D473/32, C07D473/40, A61K31/52, A61P29/00 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
C07D473/32 (EP,US);
C07D473/34 (KR);
A61K31/52 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Extension states | HR | 09.09.2011 | Title | German: | Purinderivate und ihre Verwendung als Adenosin A-2A Rezeptor Agonisten | [2011/10] | English: | Purine derivatives for use as adenonsin A-2A receptor agonists | [2011/10] | French: | Derivés de purin et leurs utilisation comme agonists d'adenosin-A2A-récepteur | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 25.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05797944.5 / EP1805181 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050797944) is 18.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1221444 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]); | by applicant | US3714357 | EP0021973 | EP0147716 | EP0424021 | WO9219594 | US5171744 | JPH0525045B | WO9318007 | WO9319749 | WO9319750 | WO9319751 | US5451700 | WO9818796 | WO9916766 | WO9964035 | WO9965895 | WO0000531 | WO0066558 | WO0066559 | WO0075114 | US6166037 | WO0104118 | WO0113953 | WO0142193 | WO0183462 | WO0194368 | WO0200679 | WO0200652 | WO0210143 | WO0212266 | US2002055651 | WO0242298 | WO02051841 | WO02053564 | WO02066422 | WO02070490 | WO02076933 | WO02088167 | WO02100879 | WO03000840 | WO03024439 | WO03033495 | WO03035668 | WO03039544 | WO03042160 | WO03042164 | WO03048181 | WO03053966 | WO03062259 | WO03064445 | WO03072592 | WO03072539 | WO03082280 | WO03082787 | WO03086294 | WO03087094 | WO03091204 | WO03099764 | WO03099807 | WO03101932 | WO03104195 | WO03104204 | WO03104205 | WO2004000814 | WO2004000839 | WO2004005229 | WO2004005258 | WO2004005285 | WO2004016601 | WO2004016578 | WO2004018429 | WO2004018450 | WO2004018451 | WO2004018457 | WO2004018465 | WO2004018431 | WO2004018449 | WO2004018422 | WO2004018425 | WO2004019935 | WO2004019944 | WO2004019945 | WO2004022547 | WO2004026248 | WO2004026841 | WO2004026873 | JP2004107299 | WO2004032921 | WO2004033412 | WO2004037805 | WO2004037768 | WO2004037773 | WO2004037807 | WO2004039827 | WO2004039762 | WO2004039766 | WO2004045607 | WO2004045618 | WO2004046083 | DE10261874 | EP1440966 | WO2004066920 | US2004167167 | WO2004074246 | WO2004074812 | EP1460064 | WO2004080964 | WO2004087142 | WO2004089892 | US2004229904 | US2004242622 | WO2004108675 | WO2004108676 | WO2005007908 | WO2005033121 | WO2005040103 | WO2005044787 | US2005133417 | WO2005058867 | WO2005065650 | WO2005066140 | US2005171147 | US2005182091 | US2005182092 | WO2005077361 |